NY A07829 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - substituted by s5236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - substituted by s5236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Joint Underwriting Association.
Title
Relates to the Joint Underwriting Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5236 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.387 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.387 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | print number 7829a |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05236 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - SIGNED CHAP.542