NY A07858 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - substituted by s4885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-10 - substituted by s4885
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s4885 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.185 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.185 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04885 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.193