NY S04885 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Title
Relates to extending the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage striped bass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.193 |
2015-08-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.185 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7858 |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.544 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07858 (Same As) 2015-06-10 - substituted by s4885