NY A07872 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - amended on third reading 7872a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - amended on third reading 7872a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care practitioners to offer health care proxy information to palliative care patients.
Title
Requires health care practitioners to offer health care proxy information to palliative care patients.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7872a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2024-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.312 |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-07-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08632 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 8632A