NY A07873 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to high school equivalency diplomas.
Title
Relates to high school equivalency diplomas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7873a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.388 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.391 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.391 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07414 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION