NY A07995 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s3702b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s3702b
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for process for rebate of real property taxes on residential real property seriously damaged by severe storm of October 29 & 30, 2012 in cities of one million or more.
Title
Provides for process for rebate of real property taxes on residential real property seriously damaged by severe storm of October 29 & 30, 2012 in cities of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3702b |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.572 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.572 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S03702 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.250