NY A08006 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to employees classified as the Triborough bridge and tunnel authority superior officers benevolent association of an MTA-employer and the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.283
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.745
2018-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5815
2018-03-26SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.573
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.557
2017-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.557
2017-06-20Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-25Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S05815 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8006

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08006&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08006&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08006
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08006&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08006&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08006&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8006#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback