NY A08007 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility and criteria for awards of grants from the beginning farmers NY fund.
Title
Relates to eligibility and criteria for awards of grants from the beginning farmers NY fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] |
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Colin Schmitt [R] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.226 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.415 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8007 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1398 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5716 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.415 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.415 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05716 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.226