NY A08016 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 8016a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 8016a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tree removal and emerald ash borer elimination costs as a tax deduction.
Title
Establishes tree removal and emerald ash borer elimination costs as a tax deduction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 8016a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05444 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5444A