NY S05444 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5444A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5444A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes tree removal and emerald ash borer elimination costs as a tax deduction.
Title
Establishes tree removal and emerald ash borer elimination costs as a tax deduction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5444A |
2018-02-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08016 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - print number 8016a