NY A08054 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - signed chap.118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public education institutions.
Title
Relates to expanding the scope of unlawful discriminatory practices to include public education institutions.
Sponsors
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.118 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1532 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6470 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.224 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.224 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06470 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - signed chap.118