NY A08065 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes regulations for the short term rental of private dwellings; defines terms; requires registration and safety precautions.
Title
Establishes regulations for the short term rental of private dwellings; defines terms; requires registration and safety precautions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in housing |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 8065b |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | print number 8065a |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05978 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5978B