NY A08082 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - signed chap.35
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to agricultural districts law improvements.
Title
Relates to agricultural districts law improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | signed chap.35 |
2016-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-04-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-04-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.176 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4851A |
2016-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.329 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.487 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.487 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04851 (Same As) 2016-04-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8082