NY A08110 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - approval memo.10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends eligibility for tuition assistance program awards for certain undergraduates who must transfer to another institution as a result of a permanent college closure by two semesters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends eligibility for tuition assistance program awards for certain undergraduates who must transfer to another institution as a result of a permanent college closure by two semesters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senateapproval memo.10
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.400
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-12Senate3RD READING CAL.1093
2018-06-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1243
2018-05-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-05-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-09Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-03Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.841
2018-05-01Assemblyreported
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-05-30Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S01243 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8110

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08110
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08110&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8110#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback