NY A08172 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims for payment furnished by providers under the medical assistance program.
Title
Relates to claims for payment furnished by providers under the medical assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-23 | Senate | tabled |
2015-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.246 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5883 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.597 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.597 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05883 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8172