NY A08172 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Title
Relates to the unearned income of a child when the parent or non-parent caregiver chooses to exclude such child from the public assistance household.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.589 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.454 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06017 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES