NY A08183 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 8183a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 8183a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing benefits payable by the correction officers' variable supplements fund to beneficiaries.
Title
Relates to increasing benefits payable by the correction officers' variable supplements fund to beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 8183a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06135 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - PRINT NUMBER 6135B