NY A08240 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers of the New York state housing finance agency to increase certain bond and note authorizations and extends to July 23, 2013 certain other finance powers of the HFA.
Title
Relates to the powers of the New York state housing finance agency to increase certain bond and note authorizations and extends to July 23, 2013 certain other finance powers of the HFA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |