NY A08338 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the makeup and structure of the maternal mortality review board.
Title
Relates to the makeup and structure of the maternal mortality review board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.142 |
2019-07-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.569 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8338 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1653 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6529 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.569 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.569 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06529 (Same As) 2019-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.142