NY A08342 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of investigators, senior investigators, and investigative specialists in the division of state police; relates to the employee benefit fund for members of such unit; makes an appropriation therefor (Part A); provides for the adjustment of stipends of certain incumbents in the state university of New York and designating moneys therefor; continues a doctoral program recruitment and retention enhancement fund; continues work-life services and pre-tax programs; continues a professional development committee; continues a comprehensive college graduate program recruitment and retention fund; continues a fee mitigation fund; continues a downstate location fund; continues a joint labor management advisory board; continues an accidental death benefit; provides compensation for certain state employees in the state university that are designated, stipulated, or excluded from negotiating units as managerial or confidential pursuant to article 14 of the civil service law and certain employees of contract colleges at Cornell and Alfred Universities; makes an appropriation therefor (Part B).
Title
Relates to terms and conditions of employment for members of the collective negotiating unit consisting of investigators, senior investigators, and investigative specialists in the division of state police; relates to the employee benefit fund for members of such unit; makes an appropriation therefor (Part A); provides for the adjustment of stipends of certain incumbents in the state university of New York and designating moneys therefor; continues a doctoral program recruitment and retention enhancement fund; continues work-life services and pre-tax programs; continues a professional development committee; continues a comprehensive college graduate program recruitment and retention fund; continues a fee mitigation fund; continues a downstate location fund; continues a joint labor management advisory board; continues an accidental death benefit; provides compensation for certain state employees in the state university that are designated, stipulated, or excluded from negotiating units as managerial or confidential pursuant to article 14 of the civil service law and certain employees of contract colleges at Cornell and Alfred Universities; makes an appropriation therefor (Part B).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.337 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a8342 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1744 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6555 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.483 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06555 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.337