NY A08400 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - signed chap.236
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-28 - signed chap.236
Summary
Extends the period of coverage for COBRA benefits under certain insurance contracts from eighteen to thirty-six months.
Title
Extends the period of coverage for COBRA benefits under certain insurance contracts from eighteen to thirty-six months.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-28 | signed chap.236 | |
2009-07-22 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.860 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5471 | |
2009-06-02 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-06-02 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-02 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.709 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-05-19 | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08400&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |