NY A08466 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention; and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Title
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention; and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.823 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | print number 8466a |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02777 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE