NY S02777 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Title
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2777B |
2014-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2777A |
2013-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |