NY A08481 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-11 - ordered to third reading rules cal.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-11 - ordered to third reading rules cal.100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires signatures of all owners of leased premises for a lease of oil, gas or mineral rights, and for any modification, renewal or extension thereof.
Title
Requires signatures of all owners of leased premises for a lease of oil, gas or mineral rights, and for any modification, renewal or extension thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.100 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.100 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-25 | Assembly | print number 8481a |
2012-05-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05898 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY