NY A08482 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - substituted by s8016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-22 - substituted by s8016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to conduct a public information and outreach campaign on medically unnecessary treatments on persons born with intersex traits.
Title
Requires the department of health to conduct a public information and outreach campaign on medically unnecessary treatments on persons born with intersex traits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-22 | Assembly | substituted by s8016 |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.234 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08016 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - SIGNED CHAP.11