NY A08521 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - signed chap.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the remote witnessing of health care proxies utilizing audio-video technology or telephone.
Title
Provides for the remote witnessing of health care proxies utilizing audio-video technology or telephone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Assembly | signed chap.33 |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-01-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.50 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8062 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.241 |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08062 (Same As) 2024-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8521