NY A08607 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.452
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the ability of the county of Albany to impose and collect taxes on occupancy of hotel or motel rooms in Albany county.
Title
Extends the ability of the county of Albany to impose and collect taxes on occupancy of hotel or motel rooms in Albany county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.452 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1962 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6097 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.548 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06097 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8607