NY A08616 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - substituted by s5596a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - substituted by s5596a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency of the village clerk-treasurer and deputy clerk-treasurer of the village of Victory, county of Saratoga.
Title
Relates to the residency of the village clerk-treasurer and deputy clerk-treasurer of the village of Victory, county of Saratoga.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Assembly | substituted by s5596a |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.617 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05596 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.140