NY A08780 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the authorization for the imposition of a mortgage recording tax imposed in Dutchess county until 2011.
Title
Relates to extending the authorization for the imposition of a mortgage recording tax imposed in Dutchess county until 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-17 | print number 8780a | |
2009-06-17 | amend and recommit to ways and means | |
2009-06-08 | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S4040 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS