NY A08788 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Title
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8788b |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8788a |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.876 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-11-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06727 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6727B