NY A08798 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.494
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to net energy metering standards for non-residential customers who own or operate farm waste electric generating equipment.
Title
Relates to net energy metering standards for non-residential customers who own or operate farm waste electric generating equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.494 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.921 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6159A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.831 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-16 | Assembly | print number 8798a |
2014-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06159 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8798A