NY A08959 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the effective date of a chapter of 2017 relating to rehabilitation programs for female inmates to require that female inmates are provided an array of programs comparable to those provided to male inmates.
Title
Amends the effective date of a chapter of 2017 relating to rehabilitation programs for female inmates to require that female inmates are provided an array of programs comparable to those provided to male inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7281 |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.805 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07281 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.372