NY A09042 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definitions of a switchblade knife and a gravity knife; excludes knives which have a spring, detent, or other mechanism designed to create a bias toward closure and that requires exertion applied to the blade by hand, wrist, or arm to overcome the bias toward closure and open the knife.
Title
Relates to the definitions of a switchblade knife and a gravity knife; excludes knives which have a spring, detent, or other mechanism designed to create a bias toward closure and that requires exertion applied to the blade by hand, wrist, or arm to overcome the bias toward closure and open the knife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Senate | tabled |
2016-12-31 | Senate | vetoed memo.299 |
2016-12-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.386 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6483A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.687 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | print number 9042a |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06483 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9042A