NY S06483 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9042A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9042A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the definitions of a switchblade knife and a gravity knife; excludes knives which have a spring, detent, or other mechanism designed to create a bias toward closure and that requires exertion applied to the blade by hand, wrist, or arm to overcome the bias toward closure and open the knife.
Title
Relates to the definitions of a switchblade knife and a gravity knife; excludes knives which have a spring, detent, or other mechanism designed to create a bias toward closure and that requires exertion applied to the blade by hand, wrist, or arm to overcome the bias toward closure and open the knife.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9042A |
2016-03-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.386 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6483A |
2016-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2016-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A09042 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - tabled