NY A09136 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain striking workers who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits.
Title
Relates to increasing the length of the suspension period applicable to certain striking workers who seek to obtain unemployment insurance benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.20 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.10 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | substituted for a9136 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.202 |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | substituted by s7310 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.10 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07310 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - SIGNED CHAP.20