NY A09215 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to evaluate their support of farmers age sixty-two years and older.
Title
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to evaluate their support of farmers age sixty-two years and older.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | approval memo.17 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.497 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1222 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7433 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.659 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-31 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S07433 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9215