NY S07433 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to evaluate their support of farmers age sixty-two years and older.
Title
Requires the department of agriculture and markets to evaluate their support of farmers age sixty-two years and older.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9215 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1222 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09215 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - approval memo.17