NY A09269 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electronic benefit transfer systems to allow for benefit recipients to cancel or lock a credit or debit card when fraud has been suspected or reported; directs that any interactive voice response system associated with an electronic benefit transfer system which benefit recipients may call for support or assistance shall include an option for benefit recipients to report fraud and cancel, lock or unlock their electronic benefit transfer credit or debit card.
Title
Requires electronic benefit transfer systems to allow for benefit recipients to cancel or lock a credit or debit card when fraud has been suspected or reported; directs that any interactive voice response system associated with an electronic benefit transfer system which benefit recipients may call for support or assistance shall include an option for benefit recipients to report fraud and cancel, lock or unlock their electronic benefit transfer credit or debit card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.393 |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | print number 9269b |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | print number 9269a |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to social services |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S08662 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - PRINT NUMBER 8662A