NY A09300 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6919a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6919a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes New York 811, Inc. to make application to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes New York 811, Inc. to make application to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6919a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | print number 9300a |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06919 (Same As) 2014-08-07 - SIGNED CHAP.233