NY A09345 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts the Varna Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., within the town of Dryden, Tompkins county from the forty-five percent limit on non-resident members.
Title
Exempts the Varna Volunteer Fire Company, Inc., within the town of Dryden, Tompkins county from the forty-five percent limit on non-resident members.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.414 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08642 (Same As) 2024-02-26 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS