NY A09537 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - signed chap.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Title
Relates to bonds and notes of the city of Yonkers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Senate | signed chap.81 |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2098 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.279 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.279 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-19 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S07352 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT