NY A09664 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7595
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Bridge as the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designates the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Bridge as the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7595 |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1019 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07595 (Same As) 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.316