NY S07595 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - SIGNED CHAP.316
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Bridge as the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designates the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Bridge as the Thomas C. Rotondo, Jr. Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.316 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.1019 |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | substituted for a9664 |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.424 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09664 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - substituted by s7595