NY A09678 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.
Title
Prohibits horizontal drilling and high-volume hydraulic fracturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.468 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06906 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES