NY A09725 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - print number 9725a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - print number 9725a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Tioga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Tioga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Assembly | print number 9725a |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07559 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - PRINT NUMBER 7559A