NY A09728 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tuition waivers for police officer students of CUNY.
Title
Relates to tuition waivers for police officer students of CUNY.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.67 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.972 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7616 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.760 |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07616 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9728