NY A09766 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by the New York Road Runners.
Title
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by the New York Road Runners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.419 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S09004 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH