NY A09789 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Moses Jacobowitz Charitable Foundation, in the borough of Brooklyn of the city of New York, to file a retroactive application for exemption from water and sewer charges.
Title
Authorizes Moses Jacobowitz Charitable Foundation, in the borough of Brooklyn of the city of New York, to file a retroactive application for exemption from water and sewer charges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | print number 9789b |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | reference changed to cities |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | print number 9789a |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-04-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07343 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to real property taxation