NY A09805 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting requirements for PCB remediation in city schools; requires the department to group schools by the year in which remediation will or has occurred on the department's website.
Title
Relates to reporting requirements for PCB remediation in city schools; requires the department to group schools by the year in which remediation will or has occurred on the department's website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.602 |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2012-04-12 | Assembly | print number 9805a |
2012-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2012-04-10 | Assembly | referred to education |