NY A09877 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to establish a Dine: Pride of New York program for restaurants which use ingredients produced in New York state.
Title
Directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to establish a Dine: Pride of New York program for restaurants which use ingredients produced in New York state.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Samuel Roberts [D] | Asm. Frank Skartados [D] |
Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.122 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S06965 (Same As) 2012-05-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE